Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3172.) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3574.) | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 28). | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2016 | Introduced. To print. |