BILL NUMBER: ACR 122CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 13 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 10, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 3, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Burke (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Brough, Brown, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Grove, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O' Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Rodriguez, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) JANUARY 20, 2016 Relative to American Heart Month and Wear Red Day in California. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 122, Burke. American Heart Month and Wear Red Day in California. This measure would recognize the month of February 2016 as American Heart Month in California and February 5, 2016, as Wear Red Day in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke. WHEREAS, Heart disease and stroke kill one in three women in the United States, yet 80 percent of cardiac events may be prevented; and WHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases and stroke kill one woman every 80 seconds in the United States; and WHEREAS, An estimated 44 million women in the United States are affected by cardiovascular diseases; and WHEREAS, Ninety percent of women have one or more risk factors for developing heart disease, yet only one in five women believe that heart disease is her greatest health threat; and WHEREAS, Women comprise only 24 percent of participants in all heart-related studies; and WHEREAS, Women are less likely to call 911 for themselves when experiencing symptoms of a heart attack than they are if someone else were having a heart attack; and WHEREAS, Only 36 percent of African American women and 34 percent of Hispanic women know that heart disease is their greatest health risk, compared with 65 percent of Caucasian women; and WHEREAS, According to the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), heart disease and stroke account for 31.7 percent of all female deaths in California; and WHEREAS, Research conducted by the CDC in 2010 found that, on average, almost 100 women die from heart disease and stroke in California each day; and WHEREAS, Women involved with the American Heart Association's Go Red For Women movement live healthier lives, and nearly 90 percent have made at least one healthy behavior change; and WHEREAS, The Go Red For Women movement encourages women to take charge of their health and schedule a well-woman visit to learn about health status and risk for diseases; and WHEREAS, The Go Red For Women movement is asking all Americans to go red by wearing red and speaking red. Get your numbers: ask your doctor to check your blood pressure and cholesterol. Own your lifestyle: stop smoking, lose weight, exercise, and eat healthy. Realize your risk: educate your family, make healthy food choices for you and your family, and teach your kids the importance of staying active. Don't be silent: tell all women you know that heart disease is their number one killer; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of February 2016 as American Heart Month in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes February 5, 2016, as Wear Red Day in California, and urges all citizens to show their support for women and the fight against heart disease by commemorating this day by wearing the color red. By increasing awareness, speaking up about heart disease, and empowering women to reduce their risk for cardiovascular disease, we can save thousands of lives each year; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.