California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill March 3, 2016

Amended

Bill February 12, 2016
Bill February 9, 2016