LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR127
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR127
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR127
Compare Versions
ACR127 Chaptered March 3, 2016
ACR127 Enrolled March 1, 2016
ACR127 Amended February 12, 2016
ACR127 Amended February 9, 2016
ACR127 Introduced January 28, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR127 Chaptered March 3, 2016
ACR127 Enrolled March 1, 2016
ACR127 Amended February 12, 2016
ACR127 Amended February 9, 2016
ACR127 Introduced January 28, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare