Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5485.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|