California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR128 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill February 4, 2016