California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR129 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2016

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2016

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2016

Amended

Bill April 4, 2016
Bill February 23, 2016