LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR129
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR129
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR129
Compare Versions
ACR129 Chaptered April 19, 2016
ACR129 Enrolled April 15, 2016
ACR129 Amended April 4, 2016
ACR129 Amended February 23, 2016
ACR129 Introduced February 1, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR129 Chaptered April 19, 2016
ACR129 Enrolled April 15, 2016
ACR129 Amended April 4, 2016
ACR129 Amended February 23, 2016
ACR129 Introduced February 1, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare