Assembly | 04/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 848.). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 483.) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2015 | Measure version as amended on February 19 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 340.) | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 17). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2015 | Introduced. To print. |