LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR13
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR13
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 29, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 10, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 14, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 17, 2015
Compare
Bill
February 19, 2015
Compare