Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5182.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|