California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016