Assembly | 06/08/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4151.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4487.) | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 14). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on . Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. To print. |