California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 3, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 8, 2016

Amended

Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016