Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4985.) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5399.) | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |