BILL NUMBER: ACR 173CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 132 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 19, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cooley (Coauthors: Assembly Members Brown, Dahle, Gallagher, Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Arambula, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooper, Dababneh, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) APRIL 19, 2016 Relative to Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 173, Cooley. Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest Day. This measure would recognize the month of June 2016 as Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month, would recognize June 21, 2016, as The Longest Day in California, and would urge all residents to wear purple on this day to help spread global awareness of the Alzheimer's Association's vision of imagining a world without Alzheimer's disease. WHEREAS, The month of June 2016 has been declared Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month to help spread awareness of this debilitating disease and the need to increase efforts to combat its human and economic costs; and WHEREAS, The summer solstice, June 21, 2016, has been declared The Longest Day, with teams around the world coming together to honor the strength, passion, and endurance of people facing Alzheimer's disease with a day of activity and advocacy; and WHEREAS, Alzheimer's disease, a progressive neurodegenerative brain disorder, tragically robs individuals of their memories and leads to mental and physical impairments; and WHEREAS, California has more residents living with Alzheimer's disease than any other state in the nation and the state's population is projected to grow by 38 percent in the next decade reaching 840,000 individuals affected by 2025; and WHEREAS, California's Medi-Cal program this year will spend over $3.3 billion on skilled nursing care and home and community-based supports for beneficiaries living with Alzheimer's disease, quickly climbing to $5 billion in Medi-Cal spending within 10 years; and WHEREAS, Alzheimer's disease is always fatal and today it is the fifth leading cause of death in California; and WHEREAS, Alzheimer's disease is a family disease impacting 1.6 million California spouses, partners, children, siblings, and other relatives who provide unpaid assistance to a loved one; and WHEREAS, California caregivers devote 1.8 billion hours of unpaid assistance to family members valued at over $22 billion in nongovernment financial support; and WHEREAS, On average, a person with Alzheimer's disease lives four to eight years after diagnosis, but can live as long as 20 years, depending on other factors; and WHEREAS, Individuals living with Alzheimer's disease and their caregivers need acknowledgment, support, and services to meet their needs over the lengthy progression of Alzheimer's disease and related dementias; now, therefor, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of June 2016 as Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month, recognizes June 21, 2016, as The Longest Day in California, and urges all residents to wear purple on this day to help spread global awareness of the Alzheimer's Association's vision of imagining a world without Alzheimer's disease; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.