BILL NUMBER: ACR 185ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Linder (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Travis Allen, Arambula, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Lopez, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Rodriguez, Santiago, Steinorth, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) MAY 11, 2016 Relative to Concrete Pipe Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 185, Linder. Concrete Pipe Week. This measure would proclaim August 8, 2016, to August 12, 2016, inclusive, as Concrete Pipe Week. WHEREAS, Reinforced concrete pipe and precast are of vital importance to sustainable communities and to the health, safety, and well-being of the people of California; and WHEREAS, Reinforced concrete pipe and precast products and services could not be provided without the dedicated efforts of the concrete pipe and precast industry manufacturers, professionals, engineers, managers, and employees who together are responsible for and must design, manufacture, distribute, educate, and supply concrete pipe and precast to public and private owners who in turn build, design, and maintain transportation infrastructure, water supply, water treatment systems, solid waste systems, and other structures and facilities essential to modern society; and WHEREAS, It is in the public interest for the residents, civic leaders, and children of California to gain knowledge and maintain a progressive interest and understanding of the importance of the reinforced concrete pipe industry to every community throughout California and across the United States; and WHEREAS, The 11 precast concrete pipe plants in California employ over 2,000 employees and provide over 32 million dollars annually in tax revenues to the state, and have helped develop various projects, including the San Francisco 49ers' Levi's Stadium, the Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit Drainage, and the Caltrans I-10 Emergency Bridge Replacement; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in recognition of the substantial contributions the reinforced concrete pipe and precast industry has made and continues to make to the public health, safety, welfare, and quality of life in California, the week of August 8, 2016, to August 12, 2016, inclusive, shall be proclaimed Concrete Pipe Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.