LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR185
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR185
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR185
Compare Versions
ACR185 Chaptered August 25, 2016
ACR185 Enrolled August 22, 2016
ACR185 Amended August 11, 2016
ACR185 Amended June 16, 2016
ACR185 Introduced May 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR185 Chaptered August 25, 2016
ACR185 Enrolled August 22, 2016
ACR185 Amended August 11, 2016
ACR185 Amended June 16, 2016
ACR185 Introduced May 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare