California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR185 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016