Assembly | 03/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:40 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 287.) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 355.) | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 17). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2015 | Introduced. To print. |