California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR19 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/10/2015

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 19CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 7 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 10, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 5, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 23, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 23, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Low (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chang, Chau, Chiu, Chu, Kim, Ting, Williams, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Brough, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chvez, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O' Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Perea, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, and Wood) (Coauthors: Senators Liu, Nguyen, and Pan) FEBRUARY 5, 2015 Relative to Lunar New Year celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 19, Low. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on February 19, 2015. WHEREAS, February 19, 2015, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; and WHEREAS, California is home to over 5 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and WHEREAS, The lunar new year is predominantly celebrated by the 1.7 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is the Year of the Sheep and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; and WHEREAS, The celebration of the lunar new year in communities throughout California illustrates the state's rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 19, 2015, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous lunar new year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the authors for appropriate distribution.