California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016