LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR194
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR194
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR194
Compare Versions
ACR194 Chaptered September 7, 2016
ACR194 Enrolled August 31, 2016
ACR194 Amended August 15, 2016
ACR194 Amended August 1, 2016
ACR194 Introduced June 8, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR194 Chaptered September 7, 2016
ACR194 Enrolled August 31, 2016
ACR194 Amended August 15, 2016
ACR194 Amended August 1, 2016
ACR194 Introduced June 8, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare