Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1620.) | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1017.) | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |