California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2015

Chaptered

Bill May 26, 2015

Amended

Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015