LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR29
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR29
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR29
Compare Versions
ACR29 Chaptered May 26, 2015
ACR29 Enrolled May 20, 2015
ACR29 Amended April 20, 2015
ACR29 Amended April 13, 2015
ACR29 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR29 Chaptered May 26, 2015
ACR29 Enrolled May 20, 2015
ACR29 Amended April 20, 2015
ACR29 Amended April 13, 2015
ACR29 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare