Assembly | 05/01/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:50 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1137.). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 744.) | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 852.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. To print. |