California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR32 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill May 1, 2015

Amended

Bill April 15, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015
Bill March 25, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015