California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR33 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 19, 2015