LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR33
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR33
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR33
Compare Versions
ACR33 Chaptered June 23, 2015
ACR33 Enrolled June 19, 2015
ACR33 Amended June 1, 2015
ACR33 Amended May 19, 2015
ACR33 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR33 Chaptered June 23, 2015
ACR33 Enrolled June 19, 2015
ACR33 Amended June 1, 2015
ACR33 Amended May 19, 2015
ACR33 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare