Assembly | 05/05/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 842.) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 966.) | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. To print. |