California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR34 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2015

Chaptered

Bill May 5, 2015

Amended

Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015