California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2015

Amended

Bill May 12, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015