LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR4
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR4
Compare Versions
ACR4 Chaptered July 21, 2015
ACR4 Enrolled July 9, 2015
ACR4 Amended May 12, 2015
ACR4 Amended April 6, 2015
ACR4 Introduced December 9, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
ACR4 Chaptered July 21, 2015
ACR4 Enrolled July 9, 2015
ACR4 Amended May 12, 2015
ACR4 Amended April 6, 2015
ACR4 Introduced December 9, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare