California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill April 7, 2015

Chaptered

Bill April 9, 2015

Amended

Bill March 18, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015