LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR42
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR42
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR42
Compare Versions
ACR42 Chaptered April 9, 2015
ACR42 Enrolled April 7, 2015
ACR42 Amended March 18, 2015
ACR42 Amended March 16, 2015
ACR42 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR42 Chaptered April 9, 2015
ACR42 Enrolled April 7, 2015
ACR42 Amended March 18, 2015
ACR42 Amended March 16, 2015
ACR42 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare