Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 635.) | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 770.) | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2015 | Introduced. To print. |