California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR44 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015

Chaptered

Bill April 23, 2015

Amended

Bill April 6, 2015