Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5486.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5855.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Measure version as amended on April 11 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|