LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR45
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR45
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR45
Compare Versions
ACR45 Chaptered September 7, 2016
ACR45 Enrolled August 31, 2016
ACR45 Amended August 18, 2016
ACR45 Amended June 14, 2016
ACR45 Amended April 11, 2016
ACR45 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR45 Chaptered September 7, 2016
ACR45 Enrolled August 31, 2016
ACR45 Amended August 18, 2016
ACR45 Amended June 14, 2016
ACR45 Amended April 11, 2016
ACR45 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare