Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Measure version as amended on March 25 corrected. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 711.) | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2015 | Introduced. To print. |