California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2015

Chaptered

Bill May 26, 2015

Amended

Bill March 26, 2015
Bill March 25, 2015