Assembly | 06/16/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1399.) | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1331.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Introduced. To print. |