California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR49 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/16/2015

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 49CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 63 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 16, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Weber (Coauthors: Assembly Members Brown, Calderon, Achadjian, Alejo, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Perea, Quirk, Rendon, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) MARCH 19, 2015 Relative to the California Senior Bill of Rights. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 49, Weber. California Senior Bill of Rights. This measure would resolve that the Legislature and the people of California should uphold and protect the dignity and independence of older Californians by continuing the state's commitment to provide these individuals with certain supporative programs and services. WHEREAS, Older Californians have worked hard all their lives to provide for their families, build our state. and defend our nation. Accordingly, for their years of service and contribution, they deserve a dignified, secure, and independent retirement; and WHEREAS, The number of Californians 60 years of age or older is expanding rapidly, and expected to reach nearly 12 million by 2030; and WHEREAS, Many Californians are living longer and working longer than in past generations; and WHEREAS, Older Californians rely heavily on local, state, and federal services, such as Social Security, Medicare, Medi-Cal, and the In-Home Supportive Services program, to help meet their needs for financial security, high-quality, affordable health care, and the ability to maintain their dignity and independence by safely living in their homes for as long as possible; and WHEREAS, These programs and services, and those who provide them, will be of even greater importance to the safety, security, and well-being of older Californians as this population grows; and WHEREAS, Notwithstanding these programs and services, older Californians experience a higher degree of financial loss in times of economic downturn and are subject to greater instances of poverty, hunger, and homelessness; and WHEREAS, Increasingly, older Californians are the victims of fraud, scams, exploitation, and even physical abuse, which threatens their dignity, financial security, and access to quality health care; and WHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the contributions and sacrifices that older Californians have made to the state, and also recognize the threats that these individuals face; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature and the people of California should unwaveringly uphold and protect the dignity and independence of older Californians by continuing the state's commitment to seek and support efforts that guarantee these individuals all of the following: (a) financial security; (b) quality and affordable health care and long-term care; (c) protection from abuse, fraud, and exploitation; (d) a strong economy, now and for future generations; and (e) independence, through safe and livable communities with adequate housing and transportation options; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.