Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1032.) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1144.) | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Introduced. To print. |