LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR52
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR52
Compare Versions
ACR52 Chaptered May 26, 2015
ACR52 Enrolled May 20, 2015
ACR52 Amended April 27, 2015
ACR52 Amended April 16, 2015
ACR52 Introduced March 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR52 Chaptered May 26, 2015
ACR52 Enrolled May 20, 2015
ACR52 Amended April 27, 2015
ACR52 Amended April 16, 2015
ACR52 Introduced March 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare