California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR73 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 14, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 3, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 8, 2016

Amended

Bill May 12, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016