LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR73
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR73
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR73
Compare Versions
ACR73 Chaptered June 8, 2016
ACR73 Enrolled June 3, 2016
ACR73 Amended May 12, 2016
ACR73 Amended April 12, 2016
ACR73 Introduced May 14, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
ACR73 Chaptered June 8, 2016
ACR73 Enrolled June 3, 2016
ACR73 Amended May 12, 2016
ACR73 Amended April 12, 2016
ACR73 Introduced May 14, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare