Assembly
|
08/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2409.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|