California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 11, 2015

Amended

Bill May 26, 2015
Bill February 19, 2015